TX HB2268 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to search warrants issued in this state and other states for certain customer data, communications, and other related information held in electronic storage in this state and other states by providers of electronic communications services and remote computing services.
Title
Relating to search warrants issued in this state and other states for certain customer data, communications, and other related information held in electronic storage in this state and other states by providers of electronic communications services and remote computing services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - HB 2268Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - HB 2268Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - HB 2268Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2013-05-27 | House | House adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-06 | House | Amended |
2013-05-06 | House | Amended |
2013-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Courts
Courts--District
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
PEACE OFFICERS
SEARCH WARRANTS
Business & Commerce--General
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Courts
Courts--District
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
PEACE OFFICERS
SEARCH WARRANTS