TX HB2267 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to compensation to be paid to an emergency services district for a municipality's annexation of the district's territory.
Title
Relating to compensation to be paid to an emergency services district for a municipality's annexation of the district's territory.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1083 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2267 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02267I.htm |