TX HB2256 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to creating a bilingual special education certification to teach students of limited English proficiency with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to creating a bilingual special education certification to teach students of limited English proficiency with disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1700 (Y: 113 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#807 (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1700
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Zaffirini
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-25SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-22SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-21SenateNo action taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Education
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#807
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1101 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2256
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02256I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02256H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02256E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02256S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02256F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02256S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02256I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02256H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02256E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02256E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02256F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2256&RcdVtNo=807&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2256&RcdVtNo=1700&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=98

Bill Comments 750

feedback