TX HB2254 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the authority of a local government to prohibit the Railroad Commission of Texas or the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality from issuing a permit for a disposal well.
Title
Relating to the authority of a local government to prohibit the Railroad Commission of Texas or the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality from issuing a permit for a disposal well.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB752 (Same As) 2009-05-25 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
WATER
Water--General
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
WATER
Water--General