TX HB2240 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study on homeless youth.
Title
Relating to a study on homeless youth.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvester Turner [D] | Rep. Naomi Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] |
Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - HB 2240Third Reading House (Y: 89 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-02 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-02 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2013-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
HOMELESS
HOMELESS EDUCATION OFFICE, TEXAS
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Homeless Persons
Human Services
Human Services--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
HOMELESS
HOMELESS EDUCATION OFFICE, TEXAS
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Homeless Persons
Human Services
Human Services--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety