TX HB2238 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the name of Texas State University--San Marcos.
Title
Relating to the name of Texas State University--San Marcos.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-04-25 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2013-04-18 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
ROUND ROCK, CITY OF
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY--SAN MARCOS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
ROUND ROCK, CITY OF
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY--SAN MARCOS