TX HB2232 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation, powers, and duties of ship channel districts.
Title
Relating to the operation, powers, and duties of ship channel districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Legler [R] | Rep. Wayne Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-05-06 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-05-05 | Postponed | |
2011-05-05 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-03 | Postponed | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
County Government--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous