TX HB2222 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of home address information of certain victims of family violence, sexual assault or abuse, stalking, or trafficking of persons.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of home address information of certain victims of family violence, sexual assault or abuse, stalking, or trafficking of persons.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Sen. Phil King [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-05 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
Family--Family Violence
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Protection of Personal Information
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
SEXUAL ABUSE
SEXUAL ASSAULT
STALKING
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
Family--Family Violence
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Protection of Personal Information
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
SEXUAL ABUSE
SEXUAL ASSAULT
STALKING