TX HB2211 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to in-person visitation with hospital patients during certain periods of disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to in-person visitation with hospital patients during certain periods of disaster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1629 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#303 (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Amended RV#285 (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1629
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-25SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#303
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#285
2021-04-15HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-15HouseAmended 1-Slaton
2021-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-07HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2211
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02211I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02211H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02211E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02211S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02211F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02211H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02211I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02211H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02211H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02211E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02211E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02211S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02211S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02211F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2211&RcdVtNo=285&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2211&RcdVtNo=303&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=97
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2211&RcdVtNo=1629&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback