TX HB2186 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the payment of a vehicle registration fee by a check drawn against insufficient funds.
Title
Relating to the payment of a vehicle registration fee by a check drawn against insufficient funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-11 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-31 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-31 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-31 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
Subjects
CHECKS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration