TX HB2184 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a public school student's transition from an alternative education program to a regular classroom.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a public school student's transition from an alternative education program to a regular classroom.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1118 (Y: 123 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Education
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1118
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1155 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback