TX HB2172 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to International Relations and Trade
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to International Relations and Trade
Summary
Relating to the exemptions from fees imposed by a municipal storm water utility on certain property in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the exemptions from fees imposed by a municipal storm water utility on certain property in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2009-04-27 | Read first time | |
2009-04-16 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-15 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-15 | Record vote | |
2009-04-15 | Passed | |
2009-04-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-15 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-15 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-03 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-03 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-30 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Utilities
County Government
County Government--General
Education
Education--School Districts
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
City Government--Utilities
County Government
County Government--General
Education
Education--School Districts
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local