TX HB215 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 80-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reporting and certification requirements by certain physicians regarding certain abortions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reporting and certification requirements by certain physicians regarding certain abortions.

Sponsors

Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]
Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Gary Elkins [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Sen. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]
Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]
Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]
Sen. Bob Hall [R]

Roll Calls

2017-08-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-04 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#65 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-08-03 - House - Point of order overruled RV#56 (Y: 92 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-16 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
2017-08-16 Signed by the Governor
2017-08-15 Sent to the Governor
2017-08-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-08-15HouseSigned in the House
2017-08-15HouseReported enrolled
2017-08-15HouseSenate passage reported
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenatePassed
2017-08-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-08-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-08-13SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-08-13SenateRecord vote
2017-08-13SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2017-08-13SenateRecord vote
2017-08-13SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-13SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-13SenateRecord vote
2017-08-13SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-13SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-13SenateRecord vote
2017-08-13SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-13SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-13SenateRead 2nd time
2017-08-13SenateRecord vote
2017-08-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-08-13SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-08-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-08-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-08-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-11SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-08-11SenateRead first time
2017-08-07SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-04HouseRecord vote
2017-08-04HousePassed
2017-08-04HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-08-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-03HouseRecord vote
2017-08-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-08-03HousePoint of order overruled
2017-08-03HousePoint of order overruled
2017-08-03HouseAmended
2017-08-03HouseAmended
2017-08-03HouseAmended
2017-08-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-08-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-07-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB215
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00215I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00215H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00215E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00215S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00215F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB215&RcdVtNo=56&Ch=H&Dt=08/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB215&RcdVtNo=65&Ch=H&Dt=08/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-13-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-13-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-13-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-15-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback