TX HB2143 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the evaluation by the Water Conservation Advisory Council of water conservation technologies for possible inclusion in the best management practices guide developed by the water conservation implementation task force.
Title
Relating to the evaluation by the Water Conservation Advisory Council of water conservation technologies for possible inclusion in the best management practices guide developed by the water conservation implementation task force.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
IRRIGATION & IRRIGATORS
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
WATER
WATER CONSERVATION ADVISORY COUNCIL
WATER--CONSERVATION
Water--Development
Water--General
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
WATER
WATER CONSERVATION ADVISORY COUNCIL
WATER--CONSERVATION
Water--Development
Water--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB2143 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB02143I.htm |