TX HB2128 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to adjudication of claims arising from certain written contracts with state agencies.
Title
Relating to adjudication of claims arising from certain written contracts with state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |