TX HB2118 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy.
Title
Relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R] |
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] | Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BOARD OF PHYSICAL THERAPY EXAMINERS, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICAL THERAPISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICAL THERAPISTS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2118 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02118I.htm |