TX HB2118 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to adding certain synthetic compounds to Penalty Group 2 of the Texas Controlled Substances Act.
Title
Relating to adding certain synthetic compounds to Penalty Group 2 of the Texas Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Sen. Craig Estes [R] | Rep. Helen Giddings [D] |
Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Kenneth Sheets [R] | Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] | Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | Passed | |
2011-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-18 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2011-05-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-03-03 | Filed |