TX HB2110 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the Private Real Property Rights Preservation Act to certain governmental actions.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the Private Real Property Rights Preservation Act to certain governmental actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-02 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Mines & Mineral Resources
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--Real Property
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Mines & Mineral Resources
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--Real Property