TX HB2109 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right of recusal from the performance of certain marriage ceremonies.
Title
Relating to the right of recusal from the performance of certain marriage ceremonies.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] |
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] |
Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Terry Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1009 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2109 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02109I.htm |