TX HB2107 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Summary
Relating to restrictions on the sale of certain motor vehicles at vehicle shows or exhibitions.
Title
Relating to restrictions on the sale of certain motor vehicles at vehicle shows or exhibitions.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Orr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-28 | Amended | |
2009-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-02 | Filed |
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General