TX HB2101 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the place for the convening of a county convention.
Title
Relating to the place for the convening of a county convention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-05-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-11 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-11 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-11 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-08 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-08 | Record vote | |
2009-05-08 | Passed | |
2009-05-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-08 | Record vote | |
2009-05-08 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-08 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-08 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-08 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-08 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-04-15 | Read first time | |
2009-04-14 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-01 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-25 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-25 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Elections | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2066 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to State Affairs