TX HB208 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 66-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-12 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the constitutional limit on the rate of growth of appropriations and appropriations of constitutionally dedicated revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the constitutional limit on the rate of growth of appropriations and appropriations of constitutionally dedicated revenue.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-12 - House - Motion prevails RV#155 (Y: 70 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-12HouseReturned to committee
2017-08-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-12HouseRecord vote
2017-08-12HouseMotion prevails
2017-08-12HouseRuling appealed
2017-08-12HousePoint of order sustained
2017-08-12HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-08-12HousePostponed
2017-08-12HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-08-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-08-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback