TX HB2070 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of sports wagering; requiring an occupational permit; authorizing a fee; imposing a tax; creating criminal offenses; decriminalizing wagering on sports events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of sports wagering; requiring an occupational permit; authorizing a fee; imposing a tax; creating criminal offenses; decriminalizing wagering on sports events.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR97 (Enabling for) 2021-04-14 - Left pending in committee
SB736 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB736 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback