TX HB2062 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1830 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#564 (Y: 127 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#564 (Y: 127 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
Health Care Providers
RED RIVER
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Taxation
Taxation--General
County Government--Finance
Health Care Providers
RED RIVER
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Taxation
Taxation--General