TX HB2057 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability of certain political subdivisions in certain workers' compensation actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability of certain political subdivisions in certain workers' compensation actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-18SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-27HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2017-04-27HouseWithdrawn from calendar
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback