TX HB2044 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to depression screenings for certain women in county jail or in the custody of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Title
Relating to depression screenings for certain women in county jail or in the custody of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Sponsors
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Josey Garcia [D] |
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Salman Bhojani [D] | Rep. John Bryant [D] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
Rep. Mihaela Plesa [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1420 (Y: 80 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1388 (Y: 76 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1388 (Y: 76 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1420 |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed |
2023-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1388 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-05-08 | House | Postponed 5/9/23 9:00 AM |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB444 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB444 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB444 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Women
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Women