TX HB2020 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of an offense prohibiting advertisements on an Internet website of certain prostitution offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of an offense prohibiting advertisements on an Internet website of certain prostitution offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-13HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2017-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback