TX HB20 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-21)
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an appropriation of money from the economic stabilization fund to decrease participants' health insurance costs for certain health benefit plans administered by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an appropriation of money from the economic stabilization fund to decrease participants' health insurance costs for certain health benefit plans administered by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors

Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Diana Arevalo [D]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Helen Giddings [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Rene Oliveira [D]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tomas Uresti [D]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. John Wray [R]

Roll Calls

2017-08-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#40 (Y: 135 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-08-01 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#33 (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-08-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#32 (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-02HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-02HouseRecord vote
2017-08-02HousePassed
2017-08-02HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-01HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-01HouseRecord vote
2017-08-01HousePassed to engrossment
2017-08-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-01HouseRecord vote
2017-08-01HouseAmendment tabled
2017-08-01HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-07-31HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-07-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback