TX HB1997 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the making of political contributions to and acceptance of political contributions by statewide officers and members of the legislature before and during a special session of the legislature; providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the making of political contributions to and acceptance of political contributions by statewide officers and members of the legislature before and during a special session of the legislature; providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Elections | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |