TX HB1990 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-23 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-23 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to a diabetes self-management training pilot program under the state Medicaid program.
Title
Relating to a diabetes self-management training pilot program under the state Medicaid program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Effective immediately | |
2009-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-15 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-15 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-15 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-13 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Passed | |
2009-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-13 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-24 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |
Subjects
DIABETES
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety