TX HB1979 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a bag limit exemption for certain participants in certain fishing tournaments in Chambers, Jefferson, Galveston, Hardin, Newton, and Orange Counties; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a bag limit exemption for certain participants in certain fishing tournaments in Chambers, Jefferson, Galveston, Hardin, Newton, and Orange Counties; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-12HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2015-03-12HouseRead first time
2015-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback