TX HB1976 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Co-sponsor authorized
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Co-sponsor authorized
Summary
Relating to the operation of property owners' associations.
Title
Relating to the operation of property owners' associations.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Brown [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Rep. Al Edwards [D] | Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] |
Rep. Jim Jackson [R] | Rep. Patrick Rose [D] | Rep. Burt Solomons [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Point of order overruled | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-14 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-14 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-14 | Vote reconsidered | |
2009-05-14 | Amended | |
2009-05-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-03-09 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-09 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB237 (Similar To) 2009-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property
RESTRICTIVE COVENANTS
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property
RESTRICTIVE COVENANTS