TX HB1962 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas State Library and Archives Commission, including the custody and ownership of certain state records and real property.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas State Library and Archives Commission, including the custody and ownership of certain state records and real property.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] |
Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1846 (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#233 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#233 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1846 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Watson |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#233 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB618 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
AUSTIN, CITY OF
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
LEGISLATIVE REFERENCE LIBRARY
Legislature
Libraries & Librarians
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
LEGISLATIVE REFERENCE LIBRARY
Legislature
Libraries & Librarians
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills