TX HB1953 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to liability for the donation and distribution of feminine hygiene products.
Title
Relating to liability for the donation and distribution of feminine hygiene products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#417 |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-31 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed |