TX HB1940 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the appeal to a civil service commission of a disciplinary suspension of a fire fighter or police officer in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the appeal to a civil service commission of a disciplinary suspension of a fire fighter or police officer in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-19 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
City Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement