TX HB194 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 10:00 am in E2.014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the minimum wage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the minimum wage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-13HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2019-02-13HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB113 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback