TX HB1936 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting certain transactions between a governmental entity and an abortion provider or affiliate of the provider.
Title
Relating to prohibiting certain transactions between a governmental entity and an abortion provider or affiliate of the provider.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. Byron Cook [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] |
Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] |
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R] |
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] |
Rep. Craig Goldman [R] | Rep. Larry Gonzales [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] |
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. John Kuempel [R] |
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] |
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] | Rep. Larry Phillips [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] |
Rep. John Raney [R] | Rep. Kevin Roberts [R] | Rep. Ron Simmons [R] | Rep. John Smithee [R] |
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Paul Workman [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed |