TX HB1936 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice by a property owner to a mortgage servicer that the owner intends to enter into a contract with a property tax lender.
Title
Relating to notice by a property owner to a mortgage servicer that the owner intends to enter into a contract with a property tax lender.
Sponsors
Rep. Rene Oliveira [D] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Robert Guerra [D] |
Rep. Armando Walle [D] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Rep. Marsha Farney [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - HB 1936Third Reading House (Y: 114 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2015-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Business & Commerce--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection