TX HB1935 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing certain general infrastructure projects to be undertaken by economic development corporations.
Title
Relating to authorizing certain general infrastructure projects to be undertaken by economic development corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
City Government--General
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--Sales