TX HB1934 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to temporary certification of an educator from outside the state who is the spouse of an active duty military service member.
Title
Relating to temporary certification of an educator from outside the state who is the spouse of an active duty military service member.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1771 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#552 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#552 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as amended |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-04-27 | House | Postponed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Military & Veterans
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Military & Veterans