TX HB1932 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Summary
Relating to consumer labeling requirements for certain health benefit plans; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to consumer labeling requirements for certain health benefit plans; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Insurance | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB815 (Same As) 2009-05-08 - Referred to Insurance