TX HB1931 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the liability of volunteer certified veterinary assistants, licensed veterinary technicians, or veterinarians who provide medical assistance to an injured animal in certain situations.
Title
Relating to the liability of volunteer certified veterinary assistants, licensed veterinary technicians, or veterinarians who provide medical assistance to an injured animal in certain situations.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |