TX HB1920 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the offense of possessing a weapon in a secured area of an airport.
Title
Relating to the offense of possessing a weapon in a secured area of an airport.
Sponsors
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. James White [R] |
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#433 (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#433 (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#433 |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Corrected comm. report distributed |
2021-04-21 | House | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB825 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Committee report printed and distributed