TX HB1919 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a defense to prosecution for the offense of cruelty to nonlivestock animals under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to a defense to prosecution for the offense of cruelty to nonlivestock animals under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time | |
2011-02-28 | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1919 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01919I.htm |