TX HB1915 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a state plan for education on and treatment of Alzheimer's disease and related disorders.
Title
Relating to a state plan for education on and treatment of Alzheimer's disease and related disorders.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Craig Goldman [R] |
Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 999 |
2019-04-09 | House | Postponed 4/10/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB999 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF