TX HB1914 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the relationship between health maintenance organizations and preferred provider benefit plans and physicians and health care providers, including prompt payment of the claims of certain physicians and health care providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the relationship between health maintenance organizations and preferred provider benefit plans and physicians and health care providers, including prompt payment of the claims of certain physicians and health care providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - Amended RV#1108 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1108
2019-05-08HousePassed as amended
2019-05-08HouseAmended 1-Klick
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback