TX HB1912 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to student buildings fees at The University of Texas at Dallas.
Title
Relating to student buildings fees at The University of Texas at Dallas.
Sponsors
Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Victoria Neave Criado [D] | Rep. Mihaela Plesa [D] | Rep. Salman Bhojani [D] |
Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#233 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - Read 2nd time RV#216 (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#233 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - Read 2nd time RV#216 (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-09 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#233 |
2023-04-18 | House | Passed |
2023-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#216 |
2023-04-17 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB696 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT DALLAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT DALLAS