TX HB1907 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notification requirements concerning offenses committed by students and school district discretion over admission or placement of certain students.
Title
Relating to notification requirements concerning offenses committed by students and school district discretion over admission or placement of certain students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-20 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-20 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-20 | Record vote | |
2011-04-20 | Passed | |
2011-04-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-19 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Corrections | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time | |
2011-02-28 | Filed |
Subjects
ALTERNATIVE EDUCATION PROGRAMS
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Juvenile Boards & Officers
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Juvenile Boards & Officers
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety