TX HB1894 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of the criminal penalty for a violation of the interior designers licensing law.
Title
Relating to the repeal of the criminal penalty for a violation of the interior designers licensing law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1692 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#371 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#348 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#371 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#348 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1692 |
2019-05-22 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#371 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#348 |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ARCHITECTURAL EXAMINERS, BOARD OF
INTERIOR DESIGNERS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
INTERIOR DESIGNERS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions