TX HB1890 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to notification of applications for permits for certain injection wells.
Title
Relating to notification of applications for permits for certain injection wells.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-06 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-06 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.